Maths is Fun and Easy….. 

  happy-valmiki-day08

Parents and Children hardly believe this!

The problem is we are taught Maths in a way which complicates the basic process of learning itself. That is why Maths is considered as one of the toughest subjects to learn across all ages. My work here is an attempt to simplify learning Maths and spread awareness of Vedic Mathematics.

I regularly get calls from parents and children from different locations to teach Vedic Maths. This is my attempt to bring knowledge to their doorsteps. And the good part is they can learn any time and at any place.

What is Vedic Maths? Veda in Sanskrit means Knowledge. Vedic Maths is an ancient system of Mathematics, over 2000 years old. This was forgotten until it was rediscovered in the 20th century by Swami Bharati Krishna Tirthaji. It’s a gift to the modern world. The base of Vedic Maths is a system of 16 Sutras (formulae) and 15 sub-Sutras (sub-formulae). The rules are in words and are very useful in solving problems in a unique and simplified manner. The beauty of Vedic methods are:

  • Simple, Creative and Flexible!
  • Easy to understand and Fun to learn!
  • Short and Speedy!
  • Appeals to everyone!
  • Removes Finger Counting!
  • Well suited for Competitive Exams!
  • Can be used for problems involved in Algebra, Geometry, Trigonometry, Calculus!

In short, the calculations can be done in 2-3 lines and even mentally, thus saving time, space and energy.

In a matter of few decades since Swami Bharati Krishna Tirthaji rediscovered Vedic Maths, it has developed into a system of Mental Mathematics and a faster way of calculating tough problems.

I will take you on a journey, if followed sincerely, will help you master techniques of Vedic Maths in a short time and will change your life forever.

Have you ever thought of how easy below calculations are?

Did we study in our school days to solve them without pen and paper, solve them in our minds and in less than 1 minute?

Why not give a try! 

  • 1000 – 647 =
  • 10000 – 57 =
  • 54 + 46 =
  • 8 x 7 =
  • 309 x 102 =
  • 88 x 98 =
  • 103 x 104 =
  • 752 x 948 =
  • 32 x 38 =
  • 61 x 91 =

If you have trouble in solving these questions, and you want to learn more about Vedic Maths, its rules and methods in detail, then this site is for you.

You will find all the topics related to Vedic Maths in VM Courses page.